EP1841071 - A/D converter, D/A converter and voltage source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/03] | For:DE
FR
Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | ||
Former [2007/40] | For:DE
FR
Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arimura, Kazuyoshi FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 02 /
Hayakawa, Atsushi FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 03 /
Ozawa, Hidekiyo FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-0013 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Kaflerstrasse 15 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Seeger · Seeger · Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Seeger, Wolfgang Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07106149.3 | 24.03.2005 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040151438 | 21.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004151438 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841071 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H03M1/0621 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,KR,US);
H03M1/10 (KR);
H03M1/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/40] | Title | German: | AD-Wandler, DA-Wandler und Spannungsquelle | [2007/40] | English: | A/D converter, D/A converter and voltage source | [2007/40] | French: | Convertisseur analogique/numérique, convertisseur numérique/analogique et source de tension | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 07.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05006493.0 / EP1598940 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050006493) is 17.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01208905 (GEN RES ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]US5319370 (DEL SIGNORE BRUCE D [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6 * * column 2, line 24 - line 49 * * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 15 - line 32 * * column 7, line 17 - line 25 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 5 * * column 8, line 44 - line 55 * * column 9, line 62 - line 64 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 15 * * column 16, line 17 - line 38 *; | [X]US6307496 (IKUTA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,4,6 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 2 * * column 6, line 30 - line 52 * * column 10, line 5 - line 10 * * column 10, line 30 - line 43 * * column 12, line 65 - column 13, line 32 ** column 14, line 6 - line 21 * |