EP1847369 - Method of manufacturing implantable medical devices with textured surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cereplas Route Zac du Faubourg de Paris 59267 Proville / FR | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leleu, David 35-37 rue des Minières 62860 Bourlon / FR | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 07106474.5 | 19.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | FR20060003568 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: FR 0603568 | [2007/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847369 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847369 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C37/00, B29C33/42, A61F2/12 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
B29C33/424 (EP);
B29C37/0053 (EP);
B29C39/026 (EP);
B29C45/372 (EP);
B29C45/73 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren implantierbarer medizinischer Vorrichtungen mit strukturierter Oberfläche | [2007/43] | English: | Method of manufacturing implantable medical devices with textured surface | [2007/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dispositifs medicaux implantables à surface textureé | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 16.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | PL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | LU | 19.04.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CY | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
TR | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5354338 (LEDERGERBER WALTER J [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 38 - line 62 *; | [DA]US5965076 (BANKS BRUCE A [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 26 * * figure - *; | [A]US6284856 (LEE IVAN S [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 17 - line 35 * * column 5, line 18 - line 29 ** column 9, line 26 - line 45 * |