EP1848247 - Audio signal processing apparatus and audio signal processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2015 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Shinichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Kubota, Kazunobu c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07106496.8 | 19.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | JP20060115808 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006115808 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848247 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Classification | IPC: | H04S3/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H04S3/00 (EP,US);
H04S2420/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Audiosignalverarbeitungsanordnung und Audiosignalverarbeitungsverfahren | [2007/43] | English: | Audio signal processing apparatus and audio signal processing method | [2007/43] | French: | Appareil de traitement de signal audio et procédé de traitement de signal audio | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |