EP1918758 - Electromagnetic micro-actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Seok-jin c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Hyun-ku c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Chung, Seok-whan c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07106952.0 | 25.04.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | KR20060107487 | 01.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060107487 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1918758 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1918758 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
H01F17/0006 (EP,US);
G02B26/08 (KR);
G02B26/085 (EP,US);
H01F2007/068 (EP,US);
H01F7/066 (EP,US);
H01F7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/18] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetischer Mikroaktor | [2008/19] | English: | Electromagnetic micro-actuator | [2008/19] | French: | Micro-actionneur électromagnétique | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4421381 (UEDA TOSHITSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]US5606447 (ASADA NORIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 67 * * figures 1,13 *; | [X]EP1054285 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * figures 1-4,11-16,21,22,25,26,32 *; | [A]EP1338912 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2005088715 (YODA MITSUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2005099709 (IWASAKI NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [A] - ASADA N ET AL, "Silicon micro-optical scanner", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20000501), vol. 83, no. 1-3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 284 - 290, XP004198328 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(00)00352-6 | Examination | US2006034006 |