EP1986059 - Pivoting device for an arbor inside a timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conus, Thierry Rebweg 12 2543, Lengnau / CH | 02 /
Helfer, Jean-Luc Rue desOeillets 18 2502, Bienne / CH | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 07106986.8 | 26.04.2007 | [2008/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1986059 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G04B31/06, G04B31/00, G04B31/004, G04B31/016 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G04B31/016 (EP,US);
G04B31/004 (EP,US);
G04B31/008 (EP,US);
G04B31/0082 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/28] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schwenkenvorrichtung einer Welle in einer Uhr | [2008/44] | English: | Pivoting device for an arbor inside a timepiece | [2008/44] | French: | Dispositif de pivotement d'un arbre dans une pièce d'horlogerie | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH198217 (LORENZ C AG [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]CH254858 (BERGER JOHANN [CH]) [X] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 8 - line 15; figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [XA]CH324263 (ERISMANN GERARD [CH]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 3 - line 15; figures 1,3 * [A] 5,9,10; | [A]CH339134 (PARECHOC SA [CH], et al) [A] 5,11 * page 1, line 4 - line 15; claim 1 * * page 1, line 45 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1587976 (KURUCZ JANOS ET MATTHEY ANDRÉ) [A] 7 * abstract * |