EP1921608 - Method of inserting vector information for estimating voice data in key re-synchronization period, method of transmitting vector information, and method of estimating voice data in key re-synchronization using vector information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Kajong-Dong Yuseong-Gu Taejon / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 161 Kajong-Dong Yuseong-Gu Taejon / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nam, TaekJun 101-1502 Daju Apt. Gayang2-Dong Dong-Gu Taejon / KR | 02 /
Ahn, Byeong-Ho 105-508, Sanho Apt. Tanbang-Dong Seo-Gu Taejon / KR | 03 /
Kim, Ki-Hong 208-503, Raemian Apt. Gajang-Dong Seo-Gu Taejon / KR | 04 /
Chung, Yongick 201, 122-4 Sinseong-Dong Yuseong-Gu Taejon / KR | 05 /
Yi, Sang-Yi 209-808 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-Dong Yuseong-Gu Taejon / KR | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07107414.0 | 03.05.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | KR20060111860 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060111860 | KR20070025571 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: KR 20070025571 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921608 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Einfügung von Vektorinformationen zum Schätzen von Sprachdaten in der Phase der Neusynchronisierung von Schlüsseln, Verfahren zum Übertragen von Vektorinformationen und Verfahren zum Schätzen der Sprachdaten bei der Neusynchronisierung von Schlüsseln unter Verwendung der Vektorinformationen | [2008/20] | English: | Method of inserting vector information for estimating voice data in key re-synchronization period, method of transmitting vector information, and method of estimating voice data in key re-synchronization using vector information | [2008/20] | French: | Procédé d'insertion d'informations de vecteurs pour estimer les données vocales dans une période de resynchronisation clé, procédé de transmission de vecteur, et procédé d'estimation de données vocales dans une resynchronisation clé utilisant des informations vectorielles | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 05.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/06] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004010407 (KOVESI BALAZS [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,7 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs [0001], [0010]-[0011] * * page 6, paragraph [0104] *; | [A] - SANG-UK RYU ET AL, "Encoder Assisted Frame Loss Concealment for MPEG-AAC Decoder", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2006. ICASSP 2006 PROCEEDINGS. 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOULOUSE, FRANCE 14-19 MAY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060514), ISBN 1-4244-0469-X, pages V - 169, XP010931316 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 171, column R, paragraph L - page 172, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2006.1661239 | [A] - STEINEBACH M, ZMUDZINSKI S, Partielle Verschlüsselung von MPEG Audio, D-A-CH SECURITY 2004, SYSSEC -IT SECURITY & IT MANAGEMENT, HORSTER P, (2004), ISBN 3-00-013137, XP002444691 [A] 1,3,7 * abstract * * pages 4-5; paragraph [2.2 MPEG Audio] * | by applicant | - "Encoder Assisted Frame Loss Concealment for MPEG-AAC Decoder", ICASSP 2006 PROCEEDINGS, (20060514), pages V-169 - V-172 |