EP1987945 - Semifinished product for the manufacture of structural parts from fiber-reinforced composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2009/22] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states SGL Carbon AG Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruch, Christian SGL CARBON AG Aurikelstr. 30 83666 Waakirchen / DE | 02 /
Heine, Michael SGL CARBON AG Gartenstrasse 7 86695 Allmannshofen / DE | 03 /
Friedrich, Claus SGL CARBON AG Kobesstrasse 21 86508 Rehling / DE | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Rossberg, Karin SGL Carbon AG Group IP Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | [2008/45] | Application number, filing date | 07107527.9 | 04.05.2007 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987945 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/88, G01N25/72 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
G01N25/72 (EP);
B29C70/882 (EP);
D04B21/20 (EP);
D06H3/10 (EP);
D10B2403/02412 (EP);
D10B2403/02431 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | Halbzeug zur Herstellung von Bauteilen aus faserverstärkten Verbundwerkstoffen | [2008/45] | English: | Semifinished product for the manufacture of structural parts from fiber-reinforced composites | [2008/45] | French: | Produit semi-fini pour la fabrication de pièces composites renforcées de fibres | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2587534 (FRANCE ETAT ARMEMENT [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 27 - line 29 * * page 2, line 24 - line 35 * * page 3, line 19 - line 28 * [Y] 6; | [XY]WO0178957 (IHC REHABILITATION PRODUCTS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * figures 13,14 * * page 2, line 26 - line 27 * * page 3, line 3 - line 26 * * page 7, line 1 - line 3 * * page 8, line 25 - line 26 * [Y] 6; | [XY]US6595684 (CASAGRANDE LOUIS GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-18 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 52 - line 57 * * column 2, line 9 - line 11 * * column 4, line 54 - line 67 * * column 5, line 4 - line 15 * * column 5, line 35 - line 45 * [Y] 6; | [XY]US2003219059 (SCOTT WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1-5,7-18 * claims 9,11,14 * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0015] - [0018] - [0020] - [0024] - [0027] , [0029] * [Y] 6; | [A]EP1431754 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 16 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0025] * * figure 1 *; | [DXY]DE102004008432 (HOTTINGER MESSTECHNIK BALDWIN [DE]) [DX] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0026] , [0031] , [0032] * [Y] 6; | [XY]US2005236098 (BLACKMORE RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-5,7-14 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0029] , [0030] * [Y] 6; | [PA] - FACHHOCHSCHULE DORTMUND, "CFK-Heizform", URL: http://download.r-g.de/beheizbare_formen_cfk.pdf, (20070906), XP002449721 [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * | [PA] - PROVENDIS, "CFK-Heizform", URL: http://provendis.patentfuehrerschein.de/public_archive/a652645a4bd196de5135c63bd085792c.pdf, (20070906), XP002449722 [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * |