EP1990599 - Bullet catcher, method and system for their recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schweiz. Eidgenossenschaft vertr. durch das Eidg. Dep. VBS handelnd durch Logistikbasis der Armee Viktoriastrasse 85 3003 Bern / CH | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haller, Angelo Schwäbis 3602, Thun / CH | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Scheuzger, Beat Otto Bovard AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Scheuzger, Beat Otto Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 07107640.0 | 07.05.2007 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990599 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F41J1/12 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
F41J13/00 (EP);
B03B5/40 (EP);
B03C1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/29] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auffangen von ballistischen Geschossen, sowie Verfahren und System zu deren Zurückgewinnung | [2008/46] | English: | Bullet catcher, method and system for their recovery | [2008/46] | French: | Collecteur de balles, ainsi que procédé et système destinés à leur récupération | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4445693 (ANGWIN RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1,4,8 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-3; claims 1,4 *; | [Y]US4858769 (DEVRIES JEFFREY S [US]) [Y] 14,25 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *; | [Y]EP0455948 (LINDEMANN MASCHFAB GMBH [DE]) [Y] 17 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]DE4405237 (SPIETH ERNST K GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,11-13,18,21-23 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 2; figures 1-5; claim 1 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 3 * [Y] 14-17,19,20,24-28; | [X]DE19503584 (BKE BILDTECHNIK INH ERNST STEC [DE]) [X] 1,5-9 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1216924 (COMPACT POWER LTD [GB]) [Y] 15,16,19,20,24,26-28 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figures 1-3; claims 1,10 * * column 6, lines 10-16 * * column 6, lines 32,33 *; | [X]US6715761 (MOBERG GERTH [SE]) [X] 1,4-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 10; figures 1,3; claim 1 * * column 4, line 11 - line 30 *; | [X]US6732628 (COBURN RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1,2,10; claims 1,55 *; | [A]US2004104533 (LARSON STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 2,3* figure 2; claim 20 * |