EP1810715 - Combination comprising an agent decreasing VEGF activity and an agent decreasing EGF activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma AG Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma AG Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wood, Jeanette Marjorie In den Kleematten 18 4105, Biel-Benken / CH | 02 /
Brandt, Ralf 6 Madigan Court Greenwith, South Australia 5125 / AU | 03 /
Bold, Guido Bleumatthöhe 16 5073, Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | 04 /
Traxler, Peter Bündtenring 3 4124, Schönenbuch / CH | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Graff, Alan Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Graff, Alan Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07108093.1 | 20.11.2001 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | GB20000028467 | 22.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0028467 | GB20010021813 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0121813 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1810715 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1810715 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/505, A61K31/70 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K31/50 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K31/50, A61K31/335 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | [2010/34] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kombination enthaltend ein Mittel zur Verringerung von VEGF-Aktivität und ein Mittel zur Verringerung von EGF-Aktivität | [2007/30] | English: | Combination comprising an agent decreasing VEGF activity and an agent decreasing EGF activity | [2007/30] | French: | Combinaison comprenant un agent pour diminuer l'activité du VEGF et un agent pour diminuer l'activité du EGF | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01997301.5 / EP1339458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]WO9702266 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DX] 1-5,7,9,10,14,16-19 * page 9, paragraph 5 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 3; example 22E; claims 11,16-18 * [A] 11-13; | [DXA]WO9835958 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DX] 1-6,9,10,14-19 * page 15, paragraph 6 - page 16, paragraph 2; example 62; claims 1,12-15 * * page 1, paragraphs 1-3 * [A] 11-13; | [X]WO9902532 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,4,9-11,14,16-19 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 28, paragraph 2 * * page 28, paragraph 4 - page 29, paragraph 1 * * page 22, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO0000206 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]) [X] 1,4,9-11,14,16-19 * page 13, lines 8-15; claims 26-28 * * page 36, lines 3-7 * * page 37, lines 22-25 *; | [DX]WO0059509 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DX] 1-6,9-11,14-19 * page 26, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 27, paragraph 1 * * page 60, paragraph 3; claims 29-32 *; | [PX]WO0147507 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-7,9,10,14-19 * page 20, paragraph 4 ** pages 12-20 * |