EP1857839 - Antireflection Structure and Optical Device Including the Same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Kazuhiro c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Int. prop. IP Dev. Cent. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-Chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Takamasa Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Int. prop. IP Dev. Cent. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
Yoshikawa, Motonobu Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Int. prop. IP Dev. Cent. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
Yamaguchi, Hiroshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, . Ltd. Int. prop. IP Dev. Cent. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 05 /
Ishimaru, Kazuhiko c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Int. prop. IP Dev. Cent. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromie 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108237.4 | 15.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | JP20060134920 | 15.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006134920 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1857839 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1857839 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/11, G02B5/02 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
G02B1/118 (EP,US);
G02B5/0221 (EP,US);
G02B5/0242 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | G02B1/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/46] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entspiegelungsstruktur und optische Vorrichtung damit | [2007/47] | English: | Antireflection Structure and Optical Device Including the Same | [2007/47] | French: | Structure antireflet et dispositif optique l'incorporant | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 11.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2013 | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/12] | 14.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19708776 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 54 * [Y] 6,13; | [Y]US2003180476 (YAMASHITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2004012856 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2005063066 (NAMIOKA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0033] - [0040] *; | [A] - RAGUIN D H ET AL, "ANTIREFLECTION STRUCTURED SURFACES FOR THE INFRARED SPECTRAL REGION", APPLIED OPTICS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, (19930301), vol. 32, no. 7, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 1154 - 1167, XP000345959 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.32.001154 | Examination | WO03098284 | by applicant | DE19708776 | US2003180476 | - DANIEL H. RAGUIN; G. MICHAEL MORRIS, "Analysis of antireflection-structured surfaces with continuous one-dimensional surface profiles", APPLIED OPTICS, (1993), vol. 32, no. 14, pages 2582 - 2598 |