EP1860856 - Method for providing idle screen layer endowed with visual effect and method for providing idle screen by using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baek, Sung-Hwan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin-Yong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Kyoung-Sik, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Choi, Hee-Woong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Jong, In-Won c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Jeon, Hee-Kyung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/27] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Baek, Sung-Hwan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Jin-Yong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Yoon, Kyoung-Sik, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Choi, Hee-Woong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Jong, In-Won c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Jeon, Hee-Kyung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/27] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108246.5 | 15.05.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | KR20060046629 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060046629 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860856 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860856 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860856 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/27] |
Former [2010/06] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bereitstellen einer Bildschirmoberfläche mit visuellen Effekten für den Ruhezustand und Verfahren zum Bereitstellen eines Bildschirmschoners damit | [2007/48] | English: | Method for providing idle screen layer endowed with visual effect and method for providing idle screen by using the same | [2007/48] | French: | Procédé pour fournir une couche d'écran de veille comportant un effet visuel et procédé pour fournir un écran de veille utilisant cette couche | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003228873 (MANZEN YOSHIHISA [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] - [0055] - [0061]; figure 6 *; | [A]WO2005003954 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 22; figures 2-5 *; | [A]WO2005039160 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 9 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1650937 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0029] - [0040] - [0056] - [0060] * | Examination | WO0223462 | US2004121823 |