EP1881315 - Pressure gauge device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kern, Christoph Wilhelmstr. 5 71546, Aspach / DE | 02 /
Schott, Steffen Stuttgarter Str. 69/2 71701, Schwieberdingen / DE | 03 /
Saltikov, Pavlo Stauferstrasse 34 71334, Waiblingen / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
Kern, Christoph Wilhelmstr. 5 71546, Aspach / DE | ||
02 /
Schott, Steffen Stuttgarter Str. 69/2 71701, Schwieberdingen / DE | |||
03 /
Saltikov, Pavlo Stauferstrasse 34 71334, Waiblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108432.1 | 18.05.2007 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | DE20061033638 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006033638 | [2008/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1881315 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1881315 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881315 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02P19/02, F23Q7/00, G01L23/22 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G01L23/22 (EP);
F23Q7/001 (EP);
F02P19/028 (EP);
F23Q2007/002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | G01L23/22, F23Q7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/04] | G01L23/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2016/01] |
Former [2011/06] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckmesseinrichtung | [2008/04] | English: | Pressure gauge device | [2008/04] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la pression | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 03.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10343521 (BERU AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,6,13 * abstract * * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0019] - [0021] *; | [AP]DE102005017802 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AP] 1,6,7,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 32 *; | [E]EP1847776 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [E] 1,6-13 * abstract * * figures 4-7 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * |