EP1814114 - Write once disc, method of managing a data area of a write once disc, and apparatus and method for reproducing data therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si 442-742 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Sung-Hee 420-403 Jugong Apt 189 Gaepo-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Ko, Jung-Wan, 315-401 Cheongmyung Maeul 3-Danji Daewoo Apt, 956-2 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Kyung-Geun 229-1006 Sibeomdanji Woosung Apt 16 Seohyun 1-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2010/17] | Rooney, John-Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2007/31] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07108550.0 | 11.03.2004 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | KR20030015858 | 13.03.2003 Original published format: KR 20030015858 | KR20030019964 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: KR 20030019964 | US20030477955P | 13.06.2003 Original published format: US 477955 P | KR20040007533 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: KR 20040007533 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1814114 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/12, G11B7/007 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP);
G11B20/1217 (EP);
G11B20/1883 (EP);
G11B20/1879 (EP);
G11B2020/1285 (EP);
G11B2020/1873 (EP);
G11B2020/1893 (EP);
G11B2220/20 (EP);
G11B2220/218 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Plattenförmiger einmal beschreibbarer Datenträger, Verfahren zur Verwaltung eines Datenbereichs eines solchen Datenträgers sowie Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe von Daten von einem solchen Datenträger | [2007/31] | English: | Write once disc, method of managing a data area of a write once disc, and apparatus and method for reproducing data therefrom | [2007/31] | French: | Disque de stockage non réinscriptible, procédé de gestion d'une zone de données d'un tel disque et appareil et procédé pour la reproduction de données d'un tel disque | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04719681.1 / EP1602104 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040719681) is 08.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0350920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,14,15,23,27-29 * page 14, lines 8-24; figures 1,2,11 * [Y] 6-8,18-20; | [Y]EP0908882 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-8,18-20 * paragraphs [0026] , [0050] , [0052] , [0055] , [0087]; figure 11 *; | [A]DE19954954 (HNE ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO SATEL [DE]) [A] 26* abstract *; | [E]EP1547069 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 8,20 * page 8, lines 4-23; figures 1A,2,4,5 *; | [E]EP1599871 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 9,10 * page 6, lines 12-17 * * page 7, lines 18-24 * * page 9, lines 1-5 * * page 11, lines 17-23 * * figure 1 *; | [E]EP1612790 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6,7,11-19,21-23,26-30 * the whole document *; | [X] - ECMA, ECMA 238 Data interchange on 130mm optical disks of type WORM using irreversible effects - capacity 2,6 Gbytes per cartridge, (199606), XP002289010 [X] 1-3,14,15,23,27-29 * pages 54-60 * | Examination | US5065388 | WO2004081922 | by applicant | EP0350920 | EP1547069 | EP1599871 | EP1612790 |