EP1868225 - Sample carrier and sample holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI COMPANY 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dona, Pleun Heerseweg 15 5504 KN, Veldhoven / NL | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/51] | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company, Patent Department, Postbus 80066 5600 KA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07108896.7 | 25.05.2007 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | EP20060114632 | 29.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06114632 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868225 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/20 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
H01J37/20 (EP);
H01J2237/2801 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/35] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Probenträger und Probenhalter | [2007/51] | English: | Sample carrier and sample holder | [2007/51] | French: | Transporteur et support d'échantillon | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 20.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 10.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0423877 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-6,14,16,18-25 * the whole document * [A] 7-9; | [DA]JPH04206333 (JEOL LTD) [DA] 1-25* abstract *; | [XA]WO9620495 (UNIV DELFT TECH [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,13,15,18-23 * abstract * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 9 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 27 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 5 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 30 * * page 16, line 15 - line 36 * * page 17, line 16 - line 25 * * page 18, line 1 - line 7 * * page 18, line 21 - line 33 * * page 19, line 3 - line 9 * * page 21, line 10 - line 23 * * page 22, line 18 - page 23, line 15 * * page 24, line 4 - line 7 * * figure - * [A] 4,12,14,15; | [XA]US2004178372 (RASMUSSEN JORGEN [US]) [X] 1-11,14,18-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0028] - [0035] * * figure - * [A] 12; | [XA]EP1503399 (ROPER IND LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9,12,18-25 * the whole document * [A] 16 | Examination | US2004245466 | by applicant | EP0423877 |