EP1895372 - Microcontainer for hermetically encapsulating reactive materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Road, AB-2B, PO Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Youngner, Dan W. 8836 Queensland Lane Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 02 /
Lu, Son T. 2911 Comstock Lane North Plymouth, MN 55447 / US | 03 /
Stark, Terry D. 8300 Golden Valley Road Golden Valley, MN 55427 / US | 04 /
Chanhvongsak, Elenita M. 16557 Javelin Avenue Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07108929.6 | 25.05.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | US20060468527 | 30.08.2006 Original published format: US 468527 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1895372 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1895372 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G04F5/14, B81C1/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G04F5/14 (EP,US);
B81B1/00 (KR);
B81C1/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | G04F5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/48] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrobehälter zum hermetischen Verkapseln reaktiver Materialien | [2008/10] | English: | Microcontainer for hermetically encapsulating reactive materials | [2008/10] | French: | Microconteneur pour encapsuler hermétiquement des matériaux réactifs | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 19.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6570459 (NATHANSON HARVEY C [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 20; figure 2 *; | [A]US6627814 (STARK DAVID H [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-8 * * column 14, lines 53-56 * * column 15, lines 54-65 *; | [A]US2005007118 (KITCHING JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0047] - [0065]; figures 8a-11b *; | [X]EP1591846 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014]; figure 2 * |