EP1862958 - Hierarchical workload monitoring for optimal subordinate tasking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitlow, Stephen D. 5701 Cambridge Street Saint Louis Park, MD 55416 / US | 02 /
Mathan, Santosh 4732 Abbott Avenue Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | 03 /
Dorneich, Michael C. 667 Goodrich Avenue St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | 04 /
Ververs, Patricia M. 2540 Holly Springs Court Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhourse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07108930.4 | 25.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | US20060442894 | 30.05.2006 Original published format: US 442894 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862958 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
Y10S482/90 (EP,US);
Y10S482/901 (EP,US);
Y10S482/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hierarchische Auslastungsüberwachung zur optimalen Verteilung untergeordneter Aufgaben | [2007/49] | English: | Hierarchical workload monitoring for optimal subordinate tasking | [2007/49] | French: | Surveillance de la charge de travail hiérarchique pour tâches subordonnées optimales | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 06.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5832187 (PEDERSEN ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US6249755 (YEMINI YECHIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2002060630 (POWER MICHAEL W [CA]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US6434512 (DISCENZO FREDERICK M [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004090764 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 31 - page 33 *; | [X]US2005071190 (HERGER LORRAINE M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |