EP1862365 - Vehicle Control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirata, Takeshi c/o Nissan Technical Center Intellectual Property Department 560-2, Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
Hirata, Takeshi c/o Nissan Technical Center Intellectual Property Department 560-2, Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 14 03 29 80453 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 14 03 29 80453 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Intellectual Property Department Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 07108935.3 | 25.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | JP20060147583 | 29.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006147583 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862365 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862365 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00, B60K6/48, B60K6/365, B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/115, B60W30/186 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60W20/40 (US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/115 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B60W30/186 (EP,US);
B60L2240/507 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2510/0291 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | B60W20/00, B60K6/48, // B60W10/02, B60W10/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/20] |
Former [2008/33] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsteuerung | [2007/49] | English: | Vehicle Control | [2007/49] | French: | Commande de véhicule | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 06.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1209017 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4-6,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0069] , [0075] , [0113] ** figures 1-9,11,12,16-21,23,24 *; | [XA]DE10158536 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0025] , [0026] * * claims 1-3,6-9 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 8; | [A]DE10204982 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,7,8,10,11 * abstract * * claims 1,2,6,7 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE10316422 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0072] * * claims 1,5,8-22 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 8,9; | [XA]DE10319880 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0084] , [0085] * * claims 13-17 * * figures 5-7 * [A] 2,3,5,7-9 | by applicant | US2003153429 | JP2005221073 |