EP1860546 - Data processing method, program, and data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Kiyotaka CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Tsukada, Tsunehiro CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
Takashima, Keiichi CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108959.3 | 12.02.2003 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020035773 | 13.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002035773 | JP20030018905 | 28.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003018905 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860546 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860546 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/1222 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F3/1259 (EP,US);
G06F3/1273 (EP,US);
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
G06F3/1257 (EP,US);
G06F3/1274 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/48] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsverfahren, Programm und Datenverarbeitungssystem | [2007/48] | English: | Data processing method, program, and data processing system | [2007/48] | French: | Procédé de traitement des données, programme, et système de traitement des données | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/28] | 05.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2018 | 16.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03003044.9 / EP1338951 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030003044) is 23.06.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5999707 (TANIGUCHI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 6,13* column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 19 *; | [I]US6089765 (MORI HIROMI [JP]) [I] 1-13 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 4 - line 15 * * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 50 * * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 3 * * column 12, line 26 - column 17, line 58 * | Examination | EP0867805 | WO0133329 | by applicant | EP0867805 |