EP1862286 - Rigid abrasive tool for facing and shaping stone-like or ceramic materials and associated manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scalari, Marco Via Stazione, 39 19020 Vezzano Ligure SP / IT | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07109034.4 | 28.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | IT2006MO00169 | 29.05.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060169 | [2007/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862286 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/00, B24D3/28, B24D18/00, C09K3/14 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
B29C39/003 (EP);
B24D18/0009 (EP);
B24D3/28 (EP);
C09K3/1418 (EP);
C09K3/1436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/33] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Starres Schleifwerkzeug zum Planieren und Formen steinähnlicher oder keramischer Materialien und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2007/49] | English: | Rigid abrasive tool for facing and shaping stone-like or ceramic materials and associated manufacturing method | [2007/49] | French: | Outil abrasif rigide pour une garniture et mise en forme de pierre ou de matériaux en céramique et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4591364 (PHAAL CORNELIUS [ZA]) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 8 - column 7, line 30 *; | [DA]US5247765 (QUINTANA JESUS B [ES]) [DA] 1,14,15* column 1, line 51 *; | [DX]EP0855249 (SANWA KENMA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 15,18-21 * column 1, line 53 - column 7, line 6; figures 1-6 *; | [PA]EP1724064 (AROS SRL [IT]) [PA] 1,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0052]; figures 1-6 * |