EP2005838 - Packaged cencentrate for preparing a bouillon, soup, sauce, gravy or for use as a seasoning, the concentrate comprising konjac mannan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [2020/08] |
Former [2009/03] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2008/52] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Chiharu, @c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier von Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Suenram, Wiebke, @c/o Unilever Bestfoods Deutschland GmbH Knorrstrasse 1 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [2020/08] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
Inoue, Chiharu, c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier von Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
02 /
Suenram, Wiebke, c/o Unilever Bestfoods Deutschland GmbH Knorrstrasse 1 74074 Heilbronn / DE | Representative(s) | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
Former [2014/41] | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2013/08] | Reijns, Tiemen Geert Pieter Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortstraat 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2009/50] | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2008/52] | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 07110026.7 | 12.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005838 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005838 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2005838 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L23/10, A23L19/10, A23L23/00 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
A23L23/10 (EP,US);
A23L23/00 (EP,US);
A23L29/238 (EP,US);
A23L29/244 (EP,US);
A23L29/27 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/242, A23V2250/5082, A23V2250/5086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | A23L1/0528, A23L1/39, A23L1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abgepacktes Konzentrat zur Zubereitung von Bouillon, Suppe, Sauce, Tunke oder zur Verwendung als Würze sowie das Konzentrat mit Konjac-Mannan | [2008/52] | English: | Packaged cencentrate for preparing a bouillon, soup, sauce, gravy or for use as a seasoning, the concentrate comprising konjac mannan | [2008/52] | French: | Concentré conditionné pour la préparation de bouillon, soupe, sauce, jus ou en tant qu'assaisonnement, ledit concentré contenant du konjac mannan | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
20.05.2010
ADMISSIBLE NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
20.05.2010
ADMISSIBLE NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | 18.06.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.01.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.01.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.01.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.06.2014 | Appeal received No. T1331/14 | 08.08.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.08.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 17.08.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.08.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | LT | 12.08.2009 | LV | 12.08.2009 | MT | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | IS | 12.12.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | IE | 12.06.2010 | LU | 12.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | TR | 12.06.2017 | HU | 13.06.2017 | [2022/30] |
Former [2020/38] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
MT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 12.06.2010 | ||
LU | 12.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 13.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
MT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 12.06.2010 | ||
LU | 12.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 13.06.2017 | ||
GR | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
MT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 12.06.2010 | ||
LU | 12.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
MT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 12.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
MT | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 12.06.2010 | ||
IT | 12.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 12.06.2010 | ||
IT | 12.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9602152 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1481595 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A] - YOSHIMURA M ET AL, "Rheological studies on mixtures of corn starch and konjac-glucomannan", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (19980102), vol. 35, no. 1-2, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 71 - 79, XP004126955 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(97)00232-4 | Opposition | US3044503 | JPS56169559 | JPS60196165 | US4676976 | US4746528 | US4746526 | US4943444 | WO9505751 | DE69311490T | US5695800 | EP0970620 | EP0981970 | WO0070970 | WO0172148 | US6391358 | JP2002335899 | EP1481595 | WO2005074717 | US2006286256 | WO2007013146 | US2007269571 | - Dalbe, B., "Interactions between xanthan gum and konjac mannan", Gums and Stabilizers for the Food Industry, (1992), vol. 6 | - Williams, P. et al, "Synergetic interaction of xanthan gum with glucomannans", Food Hydrocolloids, (1991), vol. 4, no. 6 | - Hata, T. et al, Research Relating to Konjac Mannan, (19500228), no. Reports 1 and 2 | - Miyoshi, E., "Effects of Sodium Chloride and Calcium Chloride on the Interaction between Gellan Gum and Konjac Glucomannan", J. Agric. Food Chem., (1996), vol. 44, no. 9 | - Nishinari, K., "Review of the psycho-chemical characteristics and properties of konjac mannan", Food Hydrocolloids, (1992), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 199 - 222 | - Images of concentrates prepared according to examples 1a and 1c of EP 2005838 B1 | - Experimental report (proprietor) | - Codex Alimentarius | - Carpenter, Dana, 200 low-carb slow cooker recipes, page 17 | - decision of the OD in case EP 07110027.5 | - Office communication of the USPTO regarding US 2008/0311247 A1 (parallel US application of the opposes patent) | - claims of US 2008/0311247 | - Experimental report dated 20.12.2013 (opponent) | - Picout et al, Rheology of Biopolymer Solutions and Gels | - Experimental report dated 06.02.2014 (proprietor) | - Experimental report dated 07.03.2014 (proprietor) | - Product specification SANPRO 1015/SF | - Main properties of CongelK, Andi-Johnson Group | - SCANPRO product catalogue | - Experimental report by TNO, 8.8.2014 | - Experimental report by Nestle Product Technology Center, dated 19.12.2014 | - Encyclopedia of Food Science, The AIV Publishing Company, Inc, (1978), page 642 | - Further Experimental Evidence, Unilever, dated 23.10.2015 | - Specification sheet of Pork Protein 170112 from DPS/Dutch Protein & Services BV, Tiel, Netherlands |