EP2005994 - Functional foodstuff product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOFTSLIM GmbH Schimekgasse 27 1230 Wien / AT | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pöchhacker, Klaus Schimekgasse 27 1230 Wien / AT | [2011/08] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
Pöchhacker, Klaus Schimekgasse 27 130 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07110057.2 | 12.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005994 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005994 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61P3/04, A23G3/48, A23G3/52, A23L1/30 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
A23G3/48 (EP);
A23G3/52 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/0612, A23V2250/2112 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Funktionelles Nahrungsprodukt | [2008/52] | English: | Functional foodstuff product | [2008/52] | French: | Produit alimentaire fonctionnel | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 03.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2007 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | IE | 17.08.2011 | IT | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | MT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | ES | 28.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003059501 (RIVIER VINCENT [IT]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1,14,21 *; | [A]US2005267221 (WELLEN C W [US]) [A] 1-11* claim 25 *; | [A]US2006251608 (WACHSBERG RICHARD [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * example 1 *; | [A] - CHATTOPADHYAY ISHITA ET AL, "Turmeric and curcumin: Biological actions and medicinal applications", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20040710), Database accession no. PREV200400406810, XP002463612 [A] 1-11 * abstract * |