EP2015293 - Method and apparatus for encoding and decoding an audio signal using adaptively switched temporal resolution in the spectral domain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boehm, Johannes Sieberweg 35 37081, Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Kordon, Sven Hildesheimer Strasse 117 30173, Hannover / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07110289.1 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015293 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, G10L19/14 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G10L19/0212 (EP,US);
G10L19/03 (KR);
G10L19/02 (KR);
G10L19/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodierung von Audiosignalen über adaptiv geschaltete temporäre Auflösung in einer Spektraldomäne | [2009/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for encoding and decoding an audio signal using adaptively switched temporal resolution in the spectral domain | [2009/03] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour coder et décoder un signal audio par résolution temporelle à commutation adaptative dans le domaine spectral | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004181403 (HSU CHIEN-HUA [TW]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, column L, paragraph 6 - column R, paragraph 9 * * page 2, column R, paragraph 19 - page 3, column L, paragraph 21 *; | [A]US2005143979 (LEE MI S [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, column L, paragraphs 20,23 * * page 3, column R, paragraph 47 - page 4, column L, paragraph 55 *; | [XA]US2007016405 (MEHROTRA SANJEEV [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, column R, paragraph 7 * * page 2, column L, paragraph 10 - paragraph 11 * * page 2, column R, paragraph 31 - page 3, column L, paragraph 35 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 37 - column R, paragraph 39 * * page 4, column R, paragraph 51 * * page 5, column R, paragraph 61 - paragraph 63 * * page 6, column L, paragraphs 67,69,75 - page 7, column R, paragraph 78 * * page 7, column R, paragraph 80 * * page 8, column R, paragraph 93 - page 9, column L, paragraph 94 * * page 9, column R, paragraph 102 - page 10, column L, paragraph 105 * * page 11, column L, paragraphs 110,114,115 - column R * * page 12, column L, paragraph 120 * * page 13, column R, paragraph 131 - paragraph 132 * * figures 5,6 * [A] 12; | [A] - NIAMUT O A ET AL, "Flexible frequency decompositions for cosine-modulated filter banks", 2003 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). HONG KONG, APRIL 6 - 10, 2003, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030406), VOL. 1 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7663-3, pages V449 - V452, XP010639305 [A] 1-12 * page 449, column R, line 6 - line 18 * * page 450, column L, line 17 - line 35 * * page 450, column R, line 36 - line 45 * * page 451, column L, line 16 - column R, line 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2003.1200003 |