EP1830469 - Method and apparatus for digitally removing a DC-offset smaller than one LSB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuiri, Tapio Volkukkatie 1D 12, Oulu / FI | 02 /
Walker, Simon Nicholas 12 Watchetts Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 2PB / GB | 03 /
Wilson, Alice Frances 19 Kelsey Avenue Workingham, Berkshire RG40 4TZ / GB | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner, Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain GB-London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07110473.1 | 27.11.2000 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | US19990456758 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: US 456758 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830469 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06, // H03M1/12 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H03M1/0626 (EP,US);
H03M1/0607 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/20] |
Former [2007/36] | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur digitalen Entfernung eines kleineren Gleichspannungsanteils (DC-Offset) als ein LSB | [2007/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for digitally removing a DC-offset smaller than one LSB | [2007/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour retirer numériquement un CC décalé plus petit que celui d'un LSB | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00310487.4 / EP1107459 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0454406 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XY]US5281968 (IWANAGA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1,4,14,16 * column 2, line 33 - line 68; figure 2 * [Y] 7,17,20; | [Y]WO9520270 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 20 * page 7, line 18 - line 19; figure 14 *; | [Y]DE19904052 (MITSUBISHI ELEC SYS LSI DESIGN [JP], et al) [Y] 7,17,20 * figure 1 *; | [E]WO0072447 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 25; figure 5 * |