EP1837024 - Compounds, methods and compositions useful for the treatment of bovine viral diarrhea virus (BVDV) infection and hepatitis C virus (HCV) infection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 308 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4105 / US | For all designated states GEORGIA STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC. University Plaza Atlanta, GA 30303-3083 / US | For all designated states Auburn University 309 Samford Hall Auburn, AL 36849-5112 / US | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boykin, David 1369 Springdale Road, NE Atlanta, GA 30315 / US | 02 /
Tidwell, Richard R. Route 3, 390 WR Clark Road Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US | 03 /
Stringfellow, David 2027 Canary Road Auburn, AL 36830 / US | 04 /
Brock, Kenny 501 Cross Creek Road Auburn, AL 36832 / US | 05 /
Stephens, Chad E. 3043 Lake Forest Drive Augusta, GA 30909 / US | 06 /
Kumar, Arvind 75 Jon-Jeff Drive NW Lilburn, GA 30047 / US | 07 /
Wilson, W. David 1669 Dyson Drive Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | 08 /
Givens, Daniel 483 Chadwick Lane Auburn, AL 36832 / US | 09 /
Dykstra, Christine 119 Plantation Road Auburn, AL 36832 / US | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
Boykin, David 1369 Springdale Road, NE Atlanta, GA 30315 / US | ||
02 /
Tidwell, Richard R. Route 3, 390 WR Clark Road Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US | |||
03 /
Stringfellow, David 2027 Canary Road Auburn, AL 36830 / US | |||
04 /
Brock, Kenny 501 Cross Creek Road Auburn, AL 36832 / US | |||
05 /
Stephens, Chad E. 1217 Monticello Drive Villa Rica, GA 30180 / US | |||
06 /
Kumar, Arvind 75 Jon-Jeff Drive NW Lilburn, GA 30047 / US | |||
07 /
Wilson, W. David 1669 Dyson Drive Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | |||
08 /
Givens, Daniel 483 Chadwick Lane Auburn, AL 36832 / US | |||
09 /
Dykstra, Christine 119 Plantation Road Auburn, AL 36832 / US | Representative(s) | Sandmann, Wolfgang ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Sandmann, Wolfgang Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07110507.6 | 11.01.2002 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | US20010261654P | 13.01.2001 Original published format: US 261654 P | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837024 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837024 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/10, C07D333/24, C07D307/54, C07D277/30, C07D207/32, A61K31/426, A61P1/12, A61P31/12 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
C07D405/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07D207/337 (EP);
C07D277/30 (EP);
C07D307/54 (EP);
C07D333/24 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | A61K31/505 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Verbindungen, Verfahren und Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von Boviner Virusdiarrhoe-Virus (BVDV)-Infektion und Hepatitis-C-Virus (HCV)-Infektion | [2007/39] | English: | Compounds, methods and compositions useful for the treatment of bovine viral diarrhea virus (BVDV) infection and hepatitis C virus (HCV) infection | [2007/39] | French: | Composés, procédé et compositions utiles pour le traitement d'une infection du virus de la diarrhée virale bovine et d'une infection du virus de l'hépatite C (HCV) | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02705743.9 / EP1399163 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1464999 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-18 * page 1 - page 9 *; | [A]GB1084175 (CIBA) [A] 1-18 * page 1 - page 18 *; | [A]BE641607 (CIBA) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0103685 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * claim - *; | [PX]WO0146175 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * figure 1; claim - *; | [E]WO0236588 (US ARMY MED RES MAT COMMAND [US], et al) [E] 1-7 * example -; claim - *; | [A]JPH07179856 (CANON KK) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - DAVID W. BOYKIN, "anti-pneumocystis activity of bis-amidoximes", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, GB, (1996), vol. 6, no. 24, pages 3017 - 3020, XP004135946 [X] 1-7 * page 3017 - page 3019 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(96)00557-4 | [X] - LEI WANG ET AL., "specific molecular recognition of mixed nucleic acid sequences.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, US, (2000), vol. 97, no. 1, pages 12 - 16, XP000914718 [X] 1-7 * page 12 - page 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.1.12 | [A] - V. TRALIC-KULENOVIC, "synthesis and absorption spectral properties of substituted phenylfurylbenzothiazoles", MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE., ATSPRINGER VERLAG. WIEN., (1994), vol. 125, pages 209 - 215, XP002333536 [A] 1-18 * page 209 - page 215 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00818165 | [X] - N. GELUS ET AL., "inhibition of hiv-1 tat-tar interaction by diphenylfuran derivatives.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, GB, (1999), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 1089 - 1096, XP002333537 [X] 1-7,12-18 * page 1089 - page 1090 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(99)00041-3 | [X] - M. ZAPP ET AL., "modulation of the rev-rre interaction by aromatic heterocyclic compounds.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, GB, (1997), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 1149 - 1155, XP000942641 [X] 1-7,12-18 * page 1149 - page 1152 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(97)00063-1 | [X] - L. RATMEYER M. ZAPP, "inhibition of hiv-1 rev-rre interaction by diphenylfuran derivatives.", BIOCHEMISTRY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., (1996), vol. 35, no. 42, pages 13689 - 13696, XP002333538 [X] 1-7,12-18 * page 13689 - page 13690; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi960954v | [X] - E. DE CLERCQ, "diaryl amidine derivatives as oncornaviral dna polymerase inhibitors.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., (1980), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 787 - 795, XP002333539 [X] 1-7,12-18 * page 787; table ii * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00181a016 | [PX] - LEI WANG ET AL., "evaluation of the influence of compound structure on stacked-dimer formation in the dna minor grove.", BIOCHEMISTRY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., (2001), vol. 40, pages 2511 - 2521, XP002333540 [PX] 1-18 * page 2511 - page 2514 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi002301r | [X] - POETA DEL M ET AL, "IN VITRO ANTIFUNGAL ACTIVITIES OF A SERIES OF DICATION-SUBSTITUTED CARBAZOLES, FURANS, AND BENZIMIDAZOLES", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199810), vol. 42, no. 10, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 2503 - 2510, XP000920943 [X] 1-7 * tables 1-3 * |