EP1876303 - Construction machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Kobleco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayoshi, Takanobu Kobelco construction machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gio Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | 02 /
Imashige, Hirokazu Kobelco construction machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gio Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | 03 /
Asakage, Tomohiko Kobelco construction machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gio Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Kazuyuki Kobelco construction machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gio Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07110626.4 | 20.06.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | JP20060265695 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006265695 | JP20060185386 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006185386 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876303 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876303 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1876303 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/08, E02F9/16, E02F9/20 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
E02F9/0875 (EP,US);
E02F9/16 (EP,US);
E02F9/2004 (EP,US);
E02F9/2012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Baumaschine | [2008/02] | English: | Construction machine | [2008/02] | French: | Machine de construction | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2010 | BE | 10.03.2010 | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | LT | 10.03.2010 | LV | 10.03.2010 | MT | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | PL | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | IE | 20.06.2010 | LU | 20.06.2010 | ES | 21.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | IS | 10.07.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
LU | 20.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
IT | 20.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.06.2010 | ||
IT | 20.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000096626 (YUTANI JUKO KK, et al) [Y] 1* abstract *; | [Y]JP2000160600 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2000213003 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2004124503 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2005284892 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1 * abstract * |