EP1874012 - Method and system for recording audio/video data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zheng, Pingfang Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Dist. Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07110766.8 | 21.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | CN2006191148 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: CN200610091148 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874012 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1874012 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874012 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/656, H04N7/14 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
H04M1/656 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | H04M1/656 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Aufzeichnung von Audio-/Videodaten | [2008/01] | English: | Method and system for recording audio/video data | [2008/01] | French: | Procédé et système d'enregistrement de données audio/vidéo | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | HU | 23.06.2010 | IT | 23.06.2010 | LT | 23.06.2010 | LV | 23.06.2010 | MT | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | PL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | ES | 04.10.2010 | IS | 23.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
HU | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
MT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
MT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
MT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
MT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1172990 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13,15-17,19,20 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 4,5,11,14,18; | [Y]US6430270 (CANNON JOSEPH M [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,11 * column 3, line 50 - column 7, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]WO03015384 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 14,18 * page 7, line 5 - page 12, line 21; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,9,15,20; | [A]US2003054802 (XIE FEI [US]) [A] 1,9,13-20 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]US2007121811 (YING GOANGSHIUAN S [US], et al) [PX] 1,9,15,20* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP1172990 |