EP1860642 - Apparatus and method for detecting performer ́s motion to interactively control performance of music or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishitani, Yoshiki Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
Usa, Satoshi Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Masaki Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Eiko Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte, Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07110770.0 | 10.01.2001 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP20000002077 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000002077 | JP20000002078 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000002078 | JP20000172617 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000172617 | JP20000173814 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000173814 | JP20000211770 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000211770 | JP20000211771 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000211771 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860642 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860642 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
A63B71/0686 (EP,US);
G10H1/00 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0625 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0647 (EP,US);
A63B2220/30 (EP,US);
A63B2220/34 (EP,US);
A63B2220/40 (EP,US);
A63B2220/803 (EP,US);
A63B2220/805 (EP,US);
A63B2225/50 (EP,US);
A63B2230/00 (EP,US);
A63B2230/065 (EP,US);
A63B2230/62 (EP,US);
A63B69/0028 (EP,US);
G10H2220/135 (EP,US);
G10H2220/206 (EP,US);
G10H2220/371 (EP,US);
G10H2220/395 (EP,US);
G10H2240/211 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erfassung der Bewegung eines Spielers um interaktives Musikspiel zu steuern | [2007/48] | English: | Apparatus and method for detecting performer ́s motion to interactively control performance of music or the like | [2007/48] | French: | Dispositif et méthod pour détecter le mouvement d'un artiste et commander une interprétation musicale de manière interactive | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 08.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01100081.7 / EP1130570 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010100081) is 05.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5177311 (SUZUKI HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 3,34-36 * abstract * * column 18, line 63 - column 20, line 33 *; | [X]US5541358 (WHEATON JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-16,20,21,32-36 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 5 *; | [X]US5585584 (USA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-6,10-12,14-16,21-24,32-36 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 34 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 17 * * column 15, line 1 - line 40 *; | [X]US5663514 (USA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * column 1, lines 13-32 * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 51 * * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 20 * * column 16, line 43 - line 58 * * column 17, line 43 - line 50 * * column 26, line 5 - column 27, line 55 *; | [A]WO9858364 (TIMEWARP TECHNOLOGIES LTD [US]) [A] 1-3,32-36 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 11 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5920024 (MOORE STEVEN JEROME [US]) [A] 1-3,32-36 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 20 * * column 9, line 23 - line 62 * * figures 5,6 *; | [X] - SAWADA H ET AL, "GESTURE RECOGNITION USING AN ACCELERATION SENSOR AND ITS APPLICATION TO MUSICAL PERFORMANCE CONTROL", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART III - FUNDAMENTAL ELECTRONIC SCIENCE, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (199705), vol. 80, no. 5, ISSN 1042-0967, pages 9 - 17, XP000734426 [X] 1,2,4-23,32,33,35,36 * abstract * * Sections 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6440(199705)80:5<9::AID-ECJC2>3.0.CO;2-J | [X] - PAT DOWNES, "Motion Sensing in Music and Dance Performance", 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: MUSIC AND DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY, (198705), vol. 5, no. 015, pages 165 - 172, XP002477519 [X] 1-3,32-36 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5663514 |