EP1909478 - Multifunctional peripheral [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roh, Hee-yuel 516-1006, Sinnamusil 5 danji Apartment Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Heon-soo 305-905, Shinsung Apartment, Sunae-dong Budang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Soo-hyun 906-801, Byeokjeokgol 9danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Clark, Charles Robert Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07110945.8 | 25.06.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | KR20060096369 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060096369 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909478 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1909478 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/04, H04N1/207 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/0461 (EP,US);
H04N1/04 (KR);
H04N1/028 (KR);
H04N1/207 (EP,US);
H04N1/1017 (EP,US);
H04N1/193 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/25] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Multifunktionelles Peripheriegerät | [2008/15] | English: | Multifunctional peripheral | [2008/15] | French: | Périphérique multifonctionnel | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0750732 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD); | [X]GB2421219 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 9, line 15 - line 20 * * page 9, line 32 - line 34 * * page 10, line 17 - line 28 * * page 11, line 8 - line 12 * * page 12, line 27 - line 32 * * page 14, line 17 - line 20 * * page 15, line 18 - line 30 *; | [A]EP1681845 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,11,15 * paragraph [0028] * |