EP1873687 - Parameter learning method, parameter learning apparatus, pattern classification method, and pattern classification apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitarai, Yusuke CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsugu, Masakazu CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mori, Katsuhiko CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Torii, Kan CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sato, Hiroshi CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd., European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07110987.0 | 25.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | JP20060181896 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006181896 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1873687 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1873687 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G06V40/161 (EP,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/2411 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/7715 (EP,US);
G06V10/774 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2015/39] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Parameterlernverfahren, Parameterlernvorrichtung, Musterklassifikationsverfahren und Musterklassifikationsvorrichtung | [2008/01] | English: | Parameter learning method, parameter learning apparatus, pattern classification method, and pattern classification apparatus | [2008/01] | French: | Procédé d'apprentissage de paramètres, appareil d'apprentissage de paramètres, procédé de classification de modèles et appareil de classification de modèles | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 19.08.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/47] | 12.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2018 | 10.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - VIOLA P ET AL, "ROBUST REAL-TIME FACE DETECTION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, DORDRECHT, NL, (20040101), vol. 57, no. 2, doi:10.1023/B:VISI.0000013087.49260.FB, pages 137 - 154, XP008035702 [X] 1-3,5-8,11-15,18-22 * abstract * * Sections 2, 3, and 5.4 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:VISI.0000013087.49260.fb | [XI] - LI S, "Statistical Learning of Multi-View Face Detection", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE/COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE > (EUROCRYPT )CHES 2008, SPRINGER, DE, (20020527), vol. 2353, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, pages 67 - 81, XP002367708 [X] 1-3,5-8,11-15,18-22 * abstract * * sections 2 and 3 * [I] 4 | [XI] - CHANG HUANG ET AL, "Learning Sparse Features in Granular Space for Multi-View Face Detection", AUTOMATIC FACE AND GESTURE RECOGNITION, 2006. FGR 2006. 7TH INTERNATIO NAL CONFERENCE ON SOUTHAMPTON, UK 10-12 APRIL 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060410), doi:10.1109/FGR.2006.70, ISBN 978-0-7695-2503-7, pages 401 - 407, XP010911641 [X] 1-3,5-8,11-15,18-22 * abstract * * sections 2 and 3 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FGR.2006.70 | [XPI] - ONCEL TUZEL ET AL, "Human Detection via Classification on Riemannian Manifolds", CVPR '07. IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION; 18-23 JUNE 2007; MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-1179-5, pages 1 - 8, XP031114454 [XP] 1-3,5-8,11-15,18-22 * abstract * * sections 2, 4.1, and 5 * [I] 4 | [XI] - ONCEL TUZEL ET AL, Region Covariance: A Fast Descriptor for Detection and Classification, COMPUTER VISION - ECCV 2006 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 589 - 600, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-33834-5, XP019036470 [X] 1-3,5-8,11-15,18-22 * abstract * * Section 4.1 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11744047_45 | [XI] - PAPAGEORGIOU C ET AL, "A TRAINABLE SYSTEM FOR OBJECT DETECTION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NORWELL, US, (20000101), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1023/A:1008162616689, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 15 - 33, XP008026011 [X] 1-3,9-12,18-22 * abstract * * sections 2 and 4.1.2 * [I] 4-8,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008162616689 | [I] - QIANG ZHU ET AL, "Fast Human Detection Using a Cascade of Histograms of Oriented Gradients", CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2006 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY , NEW YORK, NY, USA 17-22 JUNE 2006, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060617), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2006.119, ISBN 978-0-7695-2597-6, pages 1491 - 1498, XP010923210 [I] 1-15,18-22 * abstract * * Section 4.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2006.119 | [IP] - ZHI-GANG FAN ET AL, Fast Learning for Statistical Face Detection, NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 187 - 196, (20061003), ISBN 978-3-540-46481-5, XP019046548 [IP] 1-15,18-22 * abstract * * Section 3.2 * | Examination | - Andrew Webb, "Fisher's criterion", Statistical pattern recognition, GB, Wiley, (19991231), pages 104 - 105, ISBN 978-0-340-74164-1, XP055460257 |