EP1876040 - Tractor hitch for trailer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CBM S.p.A. Via Gazzotti, 284 41100 Modena / IT | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornia, Omero ia Feliciani, 10/2 41100 Modena / IT | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07111126.4 | 27.06.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | IT2006MO00217 | 04.07.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060217 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876040 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876040 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/46 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
B60D1/465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IE, SE [2008/38] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Traktoranhängerkupplung | [2008/02] | English: | Tractor hitch for trailer | [2008/02] | French: | Crochet de tracteur pour remorque | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 10.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.05.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | [2010/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2916300 (LINDEMAN JESSE G, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0184489 (LEMOINE MECANO SOUDURE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2289834 (CANNINGTON COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]FR2729816 (SOC ET ET D INNOVATION DANS LE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19953833 (SAUERMANN HANS [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]GB2380720 (BILL BENNETT ENGINEERING LTD [GB]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0138519 | GB2380720 |