|
04.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.10.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Reply to invitation to provide information on Prior Art |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Invitation to provide information on prior art |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |