EP2011442 - Pliers for separating two adjacent bone segments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berner Fachhochschule, Technik und Informatik (HTI) Quellgasse 21 2501 Biel / CH | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07111506.7 | 02.07.2007 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011442 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/025 (EP);
A61B2017/0256 (EP);
A61B2090/061 (EP);
A61B2090/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zangen zur Trennung zweier benachbarter Knochensegmente | [2009/02] | English: | Pliers for separating two adjacent bone segments | [2009/02] | French: | Pinces pour séparer deux segments d'os adjacents | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/37] | 24.04.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003236472 (VAN HOECK JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2005006944 (FERREE BRET A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,9-15 * figure - * * sentence 3, paragraph 7 * * abstract *; | [X]US2005038442 (FREEMAN MICHAEL [GB]) [X] 1,2,13 * paragraphs [0064] , [0074]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2006074431 (SUTTON JEFFREY K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |