EP2011820 - Anti-gelling agents for aqueous solutions of polyvinyl alcohols or ethyl-vinyl alcohol copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Europe GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hentzschel, Peter Kuraray Europe GmbH Freiheit 6c 61440, Oberursel / DE | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Kisters, Michael Marcus Kuraray Europe GmbH Patents and Trademarks Mülheimer Strasse 26 53840 Troisdorf / DE | [2009/02] | Application number, filing date | 07111627.1 | 03.07.2007 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011820 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/19 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
C08K5/19 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/19, C08L23/0853 (EP);
C08K5/19, C08L29/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | Antigelierungsmittel für wässrige Lösungen von Polyvinylalkoholen oder Ethylen-Vinylalkohol-Copolymeren | [2009/02] | English: | Anti-gelling agents for aqueous solutions of polyvinyl alcohols or ethyl-vinyl alcohol copolymers | [2009/02] | French: | Agent anti-gel pour solutions aqueuses d'alcool de polyvinyle ou de copolymères d'alcool de éthylène-vinyle | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 19.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05163369 ; | [X]US2419281 (VERNON NOBLE MAX) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 31 - line 39 * * examples I,II * * claim . *; | [X]US4990547 (STOVICEK PAVEL [CA]) [X] 1,5,6 * example -; table 1 * * claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]WO2006081617 (NOVAPHARM RES AUSTRALIA [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * example - ** claims 12,14-18 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 30, Database accession no. 1993-240088, XP002459544 & JPH05163369 A 19930629 (AICELLO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * * paragraph [0017] * * examples 1-4 * |