EP1879326 - Communication network system and wakeup method for un-wakeup node [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Atsuya Nissan Technical Center Intellectual Property Department 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 02 /
Morimoto, Kazunori Nissan Technical Center IP Department, 560-2, Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Intellectual Property Department Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | [2008/03] | Application number, filing date | 07111900.2 | 06.07.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | JP20060189676 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006189676 | JP20070156701 | 13.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007156701 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879326 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1879326 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/12, H04L12/403, H04L12/417, H04J3/16 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
H04L12/403 (EP,US);
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/40169 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40241 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/39] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsnetzwerksystem und Aufweckverfahren für einen Nicht-Aufweck-Knoten | [2008/03] | English: | Communication network system and wakeup method for un-wakeup node | [2008/03] | French: | Système de réseau de communication et procédé de réveil pour noeud anti-réveil | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004081079 (FOREST THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * paragraphs [0739] , [0921] , [1027] ** paragraphs [1390] - [1514] *; | [A]US2005129038 (HALL BRENDAN [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0093] *; | [A]US2005141565 (FOREST THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0219] * |