EP1884924 - Method for creating a context-based voice dialogue output in a voice dialogue system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Svox AG Baslerstrasse 30 8048 Zürich / CH | [2010/15] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Block, Hans-Ulrich Kirchenstrasse 42 81675 München / DE | 02 /
Schachtl, Stefanie Am Weinberg 31 82239 Alling / DE | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Stocker, Kurt, et al PATWIL AG Bronschhoferstrasse 31 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | PATWIL AG Bronschhoferstrasse 31 Postfach 907 9500 Wil / CH | ||
Former [2013/20] | PATWIL AG Patentanwälte Postfach 907 9500 Wil / CH | ||
Former [2010/15] | Büchel, von Révy & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 907 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 07112035.6 | 09.07.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | DE20061036338 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036338 | [2008/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884924 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,US);
G10L2015/228 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer kontextbasierten Sprachdialogausgabe in einem Sprachdialogsystem | [2008/06] | English: | Method for creating a context-based voice dialogue output in a voice dialogue system | [2008/06] | French: | Procédé destiné à produire une réception de dialogue oral en contexte dans un système de dialogue oral | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005131695 (LUCENTE MARK [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * Absätze [0035]- [0049] * * figures 1A,1B *; | [XA]WO2006016307 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 5,10,13,14 * abstract * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 8 * * page 11, line 34 - page 12, line 6 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 1-4,6-9,11,12; | [A] - HU J ET AL, "A system for understanding and reformulating tables", INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR PATTERN RECOGNITION WORKSHOP ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS SYSTEMS, XX, XX, (200012), pages 361 - 372, XP002417428 [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 361, paragraph L - page 362, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2006016307 |