EP1900955 - Synchroniser ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Friction Systems (Germany) GmbH Bremer Heerstrasse 39 28719 Bremen / DE | [2010/32] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Sulzer Euroflamm Germany GmbH Bremer Heerstrasse 39 28719 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spreckels, Marcus, Dr. Millstätter Strasse 22 28359, Bremen / DE | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 07112152.9 | 10.07.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | EP20060120716 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06120716 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900955 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900955 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/02 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
F16D23/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/48] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Synchronring | [2008/12] | English: | Synchroniser ring | [2008/12] | French: | Anneau synchrone | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3519811 (BORG WARNER [DE]) [DA] 2-5* figures 1,4 *; | [X]US5626214 (SCHLAICH BIRGER [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * figure - *; | [X]DE19719618 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figure -; claim 2 *; | [X]DE19922325 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * figure 1 * | Examination | EP0717212 |