EP1902995 - Door drive for an automatic door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2023 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Uwe Hornfeld 21 30982, Pattensen / DE | 02 /
Nolte, Uwe Kaltenbornstraße 40 B 30890, Barsinghausen / DE | 03 /
Sonntag, Guido Kapellenweg 6 30989, Gehrden / DE | 04 /
Ludwig, Heinz Auf der Horst 40A 30823, Garbsen / DE | 05 /
Spannberger, Jan Sallstrasse 69 30171, Hannover / DE | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 07112291.5 | 11.07.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | DE20061040231 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006040231 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1902995 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1902995 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902995 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/14 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B66B13/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Türantrieb für eine automatische Tür | [2008/13] | English: | Door drive for an automatic door | [2008/13] | French: | Actionnement de porte pour une porte automatique | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | 02
20.08.2014
15.10.2015
WITHDRAWN Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 03
20.08.2014
25.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
02
20.08.2014
15.10.2015
WITHDRAWN Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
03
20.08.2014
25.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH Opponent's representative Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | |||
Former [2021/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
02
20.08.2014
15.10.2015
WITHDRAWN Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
03
20.08.2014
25.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | |||
Former [2018/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
02
20.08.2014
15.10.2015
WITHDRAWN Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
03
20.08.2014
25.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | |||
Former [2016/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
02
20.08.2014
15.10.2015
WITHDRAWN Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
03
20.08.2014
25.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | |||
Former [2015/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Lettau, Christoph Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 D-80336 München / DE | ||
02
20.08.2014
15.10.2015
WITHDRAWN Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
03
20.08.2014
25.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | |||
Former [2014/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
19.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Lettau, Christoph Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 D-80336 München / DE | ||
02
20.08.2014
Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
03
20.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | |||
Former [2014/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Lettau, Christoph Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 D-80336 München / DE | 24.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | Appeal following opposition | 29.06.2023 | Appeal received No. T1201/23 | 29.06.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 04.09.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.08.2017 | Appeal received No. T1903/17 | 23.08.2017 | Payment of appeal fee | 20.10.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 24.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2007 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | IE | 11.07.2014 | LU | 11.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.07.2007 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 20.11.2013 | |
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0370879 (FRANCE LOGIQUE ASCENSEURS [FR]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US6137255 (SKALSKI CLEMENT A [US]) [A] 1-24 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO02055823 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003026381 (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * abstract *; | [A]DE202005006404U (WITTUR AG [DE]) [A] 1-24* the whole document * |