EP1905415 - Polymerisable compositions comprising acyl-germanium as initiators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/21] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states IVOCLAR AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moszner, Norbert, Prof. Dr. Aeulestrasse 23 9495, Triesen / LI | 02 /
Zeuner, Frank, Dr. Eschner Rütte 13a 9488, Schellenberg / LI | 03 /
Liska, Robert, Prof. Dr. Kampstrasse 3/19 1200, Wien / AT | 04 /
Fischer, Urs-Karl Berglistr. 23 9320, Arbon / CH | 05 /
Burtscher, Peter, Dr. Birkenweg 10 A-6830, Rankweil / AT | 06 /
Salz, Ulrich, Dr. Gstäudweg 55 88131, Lindau / DE | 07 /
Rheinberger, Volker, Dr. Mareestr. 34 9490, Vaduz / LI | 08 /
Gruber, Prof. Dr. Heinrich Cottagegasse 82 AT-Wien 1190 / AT | 09 /
Ganster, Beate Nussdorfer Ländle 43/94 AT-Wien 1190 / AT | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112299.8 | 11.07.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | EP20060121333 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06121333 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905415 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905415 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083, C08F4/72 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C08F2/50 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
C08F4/72 (EP,US);
Y10S522/908 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Polymerisierbare Zusammensetzungen mit Acylgermanium-Verbindungen als Initiatoren | [2008/14] | English: | Polymerisable compositions comprising acyl-germanium as initiators | [2008/14] | French: | Compositions polymérisable avec acyl-germanium comme amorceurs | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 19.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IE | 01.07.2009 | LT | 01.07.2009 | LV | 01.07.2009 | MT | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | LU | 11.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | ES | 12.10.2009 | IS | 01.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/44] | CY | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
MT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
TR | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 11.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
MT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 11.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
MT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 11.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | EE | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4457818 (DENYER ROBERT [GB], et al) [DA] 1-24 * example - ** claim - *; | [A]EP0405786 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-24 * claim - *; | [DA]EP1413569 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [DA] 1-24 * table 1 * * claim - * |