EP2014280 - Micro-particles, blood-substitute and method for forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CC-Ery GmbH Robert-Rössle-Str. 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [2014/01] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states CC-Ery GmbH Magnusstrasse 11 12489 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Charité-Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bäumler, Hans, Dr. Radickestr. 20 12489, Berlin / DE | 02 /
Georgieva, Radostina, Dr. Linienstrasse 65 10119, Berlin / DE | [2014/11] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
Bäumler, Hans, Dr. Klaustaler Strasse 30 13187, Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Georgieva, Radostina, Dr. Linienstrasse 65 10119, Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Hornung, Jan, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112474.7 | 13.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014280 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014280 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/16, B01D9/00, B01J13/14 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/0026 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/721 (US);
A61K35/16 (US);
A61K38/1703 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K38/38 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/42 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/4826 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/6927 (EP,US);
A61K9/1611 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/5052 (US);
A61K9/5073 (US);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
B01D9/005 (EP,US);
B01J13/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21004 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/38, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K38/42, A61K2300/00 (CN) |
Former IPC [2009/03] | A61K9/16, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Mikroteilchen, Blutersatz und Verfahren zu deren Erzeugung | [2009/03] | English: | Micro-particles, blood-substitute and method for forming same | [2009/03] | French: | Micro-particules, substitut sanguin et son procédé de formation | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2013 | 19.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2007 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/22] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5069936 (YEN RICHARD C K [US]) [X] 35 * examples 1,3 *; | [XA] - DUAN LI ET AL, "Hemoglobin protein hollow shells fabricated through covalent layer-by-layer technique.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS 9 MAR 2007, (20070309), vol. 354, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 357 - 362, XP002460623 [X] 35 [A] 1-8,13-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.12.223 | [A] - GEORGIEVA RADOSTINA ET AL, "Permeability and conductivity of red blood cell templated polyelectrolyte capsules coated with supplementary layers.", LANGMUIR : THE ACS JOURNAL OF SURFACES AND COLLOIDS 2 MAR 2004, (20040302), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 1895 - 1900, XP002460624 [A] 1-8,13-21,35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la035779f | [A] - SUKHORUKOV G B ET AL, "Porous calcium carbonate microparticles as templates for encapsulation of bioactive compounds", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20040721), vol. 14, no. 14, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 2073 - 2081, XP002352569 [A] 1-8,13-21,35 * page 2078, column R, paragraph 5 - page 2080, column L, paragraph L; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b402617a | by applicant | US5069936 | - DUAN LI ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2007), vol. 354, pages 357 - 362 |