EP2014821 - Home laundry drier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | ||
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Belgicastraat 17 1930 Zaventem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favret, Ugo Via Morassutti, 12 33072, CASARSA / IT | 02 /
Noviello, Flavio Via Grandi, 7 33081, AVIANO / IT | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | ||
Former [2011/32] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07112495.2 | 13.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014821 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014821 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
D06F58/203 (EP,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
D06F58/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner für den Haushalt | [2009/03] | English: | Home laundry drier | [2009/03] | French: | Sèche-linge domestique | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | MT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | IE | 13.07.2011 | LU | 13.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3869815 (BULLOCK NORMAN J) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 57 - column 2, line 68 * * column 6, line 44 - column 8, line 34 *; | [A]US4519145 (MANDEL SHELDON W [US]) [A] 1,9-11* figure 1 *; | [X]EP1441059 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007006484 (MOSCHUETZ HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,8-11 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0040] * | by applicant | US3869815 | US4519145 | EP1441059 | US2007006484 |