EP1845718 - Image signal reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For:DE
FR
GB
Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/42] | For:DE
FR
GB
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itani, Tetsuya 2-8, Hikarigaoka 2-chome Ikoma-shi Nara 630-0141 / JP | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112511.6 | 22.12.1999 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | JP19980364558 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36455898 | JP19990011815 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1181599 | JP19990012824 | 21.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1282499 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1845718 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1845718 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/46, H04N7/01, H04N9/79 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N7/0112 (EP,US);
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bildsignalwiedergabe | [2007/42] | English: | Image signal reproduction apparatus | [2007/42] | French: | Appareil de reproduction d'un signal d'image | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99961348.2 / EP1065879 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990961348) is 12.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5353119 (DORRICOTT MARTIN R [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 51, line 37 - column 57, line 39; figures 67-70 *; | [A]GB2326304 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 7 - page 10, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [PA]EP0888018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * column 13, line 56 - column 18, line 39; figures 20,41 *; | [PA]EP0944269 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0105] ** paragraph [0280]; figure 20 * |