EP2017622 - Method for determining the concentration of a molecule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DKFZ Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum, Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states DKFZ Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum, Stiftung des Öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, Wolf Dieter Schröderstrasse 67 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Winter, Dominic Talstrasse 43 69221 Dossenheim / DE | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112749.2 | 19.07.2007 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017622 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/6848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Konzentration eines Moleküls | [2009/04] | English: | Method for determining the concentration of a molecule | [2009/04] | French: | Procédé de détermination de la concentration d'une molécule | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0161028 (SEQUEL GENETICS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * * example 5 *; | [A]WO02084250 (FEMTOLINK BIOTECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 15, line 1 - line 14 *; | [A]WO2006082389 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 12, line 6 - page 16, line 9 * * page 26, line 13 - page 29, line 16 *; | [A]WO2007031080 (ALK ABELLO AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A] - BUCKNALL M ET AL, "Practical quantitative biomedical applications of MALDI-TOF mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (200209), vol. 13, no. 9, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 1015 - 1027, XP004379111 [A] 1-13 * page 1017 * * figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1044-0305(02)00426-9 | [A] - VAN DER REST G ET AL, "Gas-phase cleavage of PTC-derivatized electrosprayed tryptic peptides in an FT-ICR trapped-ion cell: mass-based protein identification without liquid chromatographic separation", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (200103), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 288 - 295, XP004317450 [A] 1-13 * page 289, column LEFT, paragraph 1 * * page 290 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1044-0305(00)00230-0 |