EP1884663 - Peristaltic pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bredel Hose Pumps B.V. Sluisstraat 7 7491 GA Delden / NL | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schippers, Dinant Hendrik Dinant Dijkhuisstraat 11 7558 GJ Hengelo / NL | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Schumann Patent Consultancy B.V., Kerkedennen 43 7621 EB Borne / NL | Application number, filing date | 07112809.4 | 19.07.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | NL20061000167 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: NL 1000167 | [2008/06] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884663 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
F04B43/1253 (EP,US);
F04B43/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Peristaltische Pumpe | [2008/06] | English: | Peristaltic pump | [2008/06] | French: | Pompe péristaltique | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB713239 (AMES CROSTA MILLS & COMPANY LT) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 36-40,61-63; figures 1-3 * * page 2, lines 1-19,48-60,79-82,95-97,102-105,115-117 *; | [X]DE3703124 (STREICHER MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 7, lines 28,29; figure 11 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 31 *; | [A]WO9116542 (BREDEL EXPLOITATIE BV [NL]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]DE4303319 (PUTZMEISTER MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10,15 * abstract *; | [A]US6171082 (HANKNER DOULAS O [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * |