EP2016825 - Antimicrobial anorganic active components with low abrasion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanitized AG Lyssachstrasse 95 3400 Burgdorf / CH | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Dietmar Im Gerbelacker 44 3063 Ittigen / CH | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112811.0 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2016825 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/08, A01N59/16, D06M11/83, C03C3/00 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
A01N25/08 (EP);
A01N59/16 (EP);
C03C12/00 (EP);
D06M11/83 (EP);
D06M16/00 (EP);
D06M23/08 (EP);
C03C2204/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N59/16, A01N25/08, A01N25/10, A01N25/34, A01N59/20 (EP) | Designated contracting states | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle anorganische Wirkstoffkomponente mit niedriger Abrasion | [2009/04] | English: | Antimicrobial anorganic active components with low abrasion | [2009/04] | French: | Agent actif inorganique antimicrobien faiblement abrasif | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03018495 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10-14 * - 3.-4. Absatz-; page 3 * * page 6 * * -5. Absatz-; page 7 * * -Ausführungsbeispiele-; page 8 - page 9; table 1 * * claim 14 * [Y] 1-16; | [DX]US6831028 (ISHII MASAO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-16 * Beispiel 1 * * column 2, lines 40-46 * * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 23 * * column 12, line 44 - column 13, line 55 *; | [XY]WO2005033034 (SCHOTT AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10,12-14 * page 11, lines 1-10 * * page 13, lines 20-31 * * claims 5,6 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY] - KAWASHITA M. ET AL., "Preparation of silver-doped silica glass microspheres", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH PART A, Wiley Periodicals, (200308), vol. 66, no. 2, pages 266 - 274, XP002467425 [X] 1-4 * - discussion -; page 273 - page 274; figure 10 * [Y] 12-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.10547 |