EP1881002 - HCV NS-3 serine protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tibotec Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Eastgate Village Eastgate Little Island Co Cork / IE | For all designated states MEDIVIR AB Lunastigen 7 141 44 Huddinge / SE | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salvador Oden, Lourdes c/o Medivir AB Lunastigen 7 S-141 44, Huddinge / SE | 02 /
Nilsson, Karl Magnus c/o Medivir AB Lunastigen 7 S-141 44, Huddinge / SE | 03 /
Rosenquist, Asa Annica Kristina c/o Medivir AB Lunastigen 7 S-141 44, Huddinge / SE | 04 /
Samuelsson, Bengt Bertil c/o Medivir AB Lunastigen 7 S-141 44, Huddinge / SE | 05 /
Raboisson, Pierre Jean-Marie Bernard Rue Jolie 3 1331, Rosieres / BE | 06 /
De Kock, Herman Wolfseind 10 2370, Arendonk / BE | 07 /
Vendeville, Sandrine Marie Helene Rue du Bémel 142 1150, Woluwe-Saint-Pierre / BE | 08 /
Simmen, Kenneth Alan Boterbloemenlaan 35 3080, Tervuren / BE | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Wante, Dirk Paul Maria, et al Tibotec-Virco Virology BVBA Generaal De Wittelaan L11 B3 2800 Mechelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Wante, Dirk Paul Maria, et al Tibotec-Virco Comm. VA J&J Patent Law Department Generaal De Wittelaan L11 B3 2800 Mechelen / BE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Wante, Dirk Paul Maria, et al Tibotec-Virco Comm. VA J&J Patent law department Generaal De Wittelaan L 11B 3 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 07112899.5 | 20.07.2007 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | EP20060117605 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06117605 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881002 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07D215/00, A61K38/55, A61K38/05, A61K38/06, A61K38/07 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C07K5/0217 (EP);
C07K5/02 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | HCV-NS-3-Serinproteaseinhibitoren | [2008/04] | English: | HCV NS-3 serine protease inhibitors | [2008/04] | French: | Inhibiteurs de la sérine protéase HCV NS-3 | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/38] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005010029 (ENANTA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 1; examples 4-24 * * Formula I * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]WO2005073195 (MEDIVIR AB [SE], et al) [Y] 4-7 * Formula VI, Examples 39, 40 *; | [A]WO2005113581 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claim 24 *; | [A] - KAI LIN, ANN D KWONG, CHAO LIN, "Combination of a Hepititis C Virus NS3-NS4A Protease Inhibitor and Alpha Interferon Synergistically Inhibits Viral RNA Replication and Facilitates Viral RNA Clearance in Replicon Cells", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (200412), vol. 48, no. 12, pages 4784 - 4792, XP002447085 [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.48.12.4784-4792.2004 | [A] - PERNI R B ET AL, "INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS NS3.4A PROTEASE. PART 3: P2 PROLINE VARIANTS", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (20040419), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1939 - 1942, XP008037248 [A] 1-10 * compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.01.078 |