EP1883003 - Electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Masumi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Michimasa c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Tsunoda, Yosuke c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Ohnishi, Masuo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Hattori, Masahiko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07113061.1 | 24.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | JP20060202283 | 25.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006202283 | [2008/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1883003 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1883003 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
G06F1/203 (EP,KR,US);
F28D1/024 (EP,KR,US);
F28D15/00 (EP,KR,US);
F28F13/06 (EP,KR,US);
F28F3/02 (EP,KR,US);
F28F3/12 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/33] |
Former [2008/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung | [2008/05] | English: | Electronic apparatus | [2008/05] | French: | Appareil électronique | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 07.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 24.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/43] | 05.06.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6313990 (CHEON KIOAN [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 12; figures 1-8 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]WO0190867 (CHEON KIOAN [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2,3; | [A]US2005007739 (HATA YUKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [X]US2006067047 (PFAHNL ANDREAS C [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US2002039279 | US2003042003 | JP2003248530 | EP1519645 |