EP1886808 - Multilayer coextruded plastics roofing sheets with an upper layer of poly(acrylonitrile-styrene-acrylate) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUR.EX S.r.l. Strada Acquasalata 5/B 47899 Serravalle / SM | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santi, Emiliano Via Lichene 22 47899, Serravalle / SM | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Attilio, et al Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [2008/07] | Application number, filing date | 07113475.3 | 31.07.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | IT2006GE00087 | 11.08.2006 Original published format: IT GE20060087 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886808 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/28, E04D3/35, E04D5/10 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/28 (EP);
E04D3/35 (EP);
E04D5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/43] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige coextrudierte Kunststoffdachbahnen mit Deckschicht aus einem Acrylnitril-Styrol-Acrylat-copolymer | [2008/07] | English: | Multilayer coextruded plastics roofing sheets with an upper layer of poly(acrylonitrile-styrene-acrylate) | [2008/07] | French: | Bandes de toiture en matière plastique coextrudée ayant une couche supérieure en polymère acrylonitrile/styrène/acrylester | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5306548 (ZABROCKI VINCENT S [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,12 *; | [X]US5334450 (ZABROCKI VINCENT S [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 32 - line 42; claim 1 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 6 *; | [X]WO0172514 (BUILDING LITE IND INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 29; claims 1,4 *; | [X]US2003211347 (RABINOVITCH ELVIRA B [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0007] , [0019] , [0021] , [0024]; claims 1,5,19,21,28 *; | [PX]US2007092707 (ANDERSON GREGORY [US], et al) [PX] 1,2* paragraphs [0001] , [0008]; example -; claims 1,2,7 * |