EP1884635 - Power transmission device for agricultural or industrial vehicles and method for operating such a power transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2018/36] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sobotzik Dr., Joachim Bürgermeister-Wingerter-Str.26a 67245, Lambsheim / DE | [2018/36] |
Former [2008/06] | 01 /
Sobotzik Dr., Joachim Bürgermeister-Wingerter-Str.26a 67245, Lambsheim / DE | Representative(s) | John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | Bradl, Joachim Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07113712.9 | 02.08.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | DE20061036589 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036589 | [2008/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1884635 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1884635 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884635 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/04, F02B67/08, // F01P11/10 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
F01P7/048 (EP,US);
F02B67/08 (EP,US);
F01P11/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/06] | F01P7/04, // F01P11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/36] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für ein landwirtschaftliches oder industrielles Nutzfahrzeug und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Antriebsvorrichtung | [2008/06] | English: | Power transmission device for agricultural or industrial vehicles and method for operating such a power transmission device | [2008/06] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour un véhicule utilitaire industriel ou agricole et procédé de fonctionnement d'un dispositif d'entraînement | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2007 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.08.2007 | |
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | ES | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | ES | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | LT | 05.09.2018 | |
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63186910 (KUBOTA LTD) [X] 1,5,20-22 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]US5415134 (STEWART JR HOWARD C [US]) [Y] 3,4,6,17-19 * abstract * * figures 1-11 *; | [XYI]JPH11241368 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,13,14,16,22 * abstract * * figure - * [Y] 3,4,6,17-19 [I] 10-12,15; | [XYI]JP2000203274 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,13,16,22 * abstract * * figure - * [Y] 3,4,6,17-19 [I] 10-12,14,15; | [X]JP2001020740 (DENYO CO LTD) [X] 1,22* figure - * | Examination | DE3043477 | EP1241358 | US2005284423 | by applicant | JPS63186910 | US5415134 | JPH11241368 | JP2000203274 | DE102004052023 |