EP1886830 - Sheet Alignment Mechanism, Sheet Post-Processing Apparatus, and Image Forming Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2016/47] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Nobuyoshi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Masahiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku 143-8555, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nagasako, Shuuya Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Kazuhiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Satoh, Shohichi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Kunieda, Akira Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
Nomura, Tomoichi RICOH ELEMEX CORPORATION 2-14-29, Uchiyama, Chikus Aichi 464-0075 / JP | 08 /
Maeda, Hiroshi RICOH ELEMEX CORPORATION 2-14-29, Uchiyama, Chikus Aichi 464-0075 / JP | [2016/35] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Suzuki, Nobuyoshi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Tamura, Masahiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- 143-8555, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Nagasako, Shuuya Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
04 /
Kobayashi, Kazuhiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
05 /
Satoh, Shohichi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
06 /
Kunieda, Akira Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
07 /
Nomura, Tomoichi RICOH ELEMEX CORPORATION 2-14-29, Uchiyama, Chikus Aichi 464-0075 / JP | |||
08 /
Maeda, Hiroshi RICOH ELEMEX CORPORATION 2-14-29, Uchiyama, Chikus Aichi 464-0075 / JP | |||
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
Suzuki, Nobuyoshi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Tamura, Masahiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- 143-8555, Tokyo / JO | |||
03 /
Nagasako, Shuuya Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
04 /
Kobayashi, Kazuhiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
05 /
Satoh, Shohichi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
06 /
Kunieda, Akira Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta- Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
07 /
Nomura, Tomoichi RICOH ELEMEX CORPORATION 2-14-29, Uchiyama, Chikus Aichi 464-0075 / JP | |||
08 /
Maeda, Hiroshi RICOH ELEMEX CORPORATION 2-14-29, Uchiyama, Chikus Aichi 464-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07113954.7 | 07.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | JP20060220470 | 11.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006220470 | JP20070140973 | 28.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007140973 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1886830 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1886830 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886830 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42C1/12, B65H31/34, G03G15/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B42C1/12 (EP,US);
B65H31/34 (EP,US);
G03G15/6552 (EP,US);
B65H2301/36212 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00421 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/03, B65H2220/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | B42C1/12, B65H31/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/29] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blechausrichtungsmechanismus, Blechnachbearbeitungsvorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2008/07] | English: | Sheet Alignment Mechanism, Sheet Post-Processing Apparatus, and Image Forming Apparatus | [2008/07] | French: | Mécanisme d'alignement de feuille, appareil de traitement ultérieur de feuille, et appareil de formation d'images | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 10.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5263697 (YAMAZAKI HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * abstract * * column 6, paragraph 64 - column 7, paragraph 12 * * column 10, line 67 - column 11, line 20 * * column 8, lines 28-60 * [A] 9,10 [Y] 5-8 [I] 3; | [Y]US5447297 (MURATA MITSUSHIGE [JP], et al) [Y] 5-8 * abstract ** column 4, lines 20-29 *; | [X]JP3639429B (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | US5263697 | US5447297 | JPH11272028 |