EP1919068 - Regulator for isolated flyback power supply using primary side sensing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035-7417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states LINEAR TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035-7417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Negrete, Michael 282 S. Shoreline Blvd. Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07113960.4 | 07.08.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | US20060499726 | 07.08.2006 Original published format: US 499726 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919068 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1919068 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
H02M3/33507 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/15] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regler für einen isolierten Schaltnetzteil-Sperrwandler mit primärseitiger Erfassung | [2008/19] | English: | Regulator for isolated flyback power supply using primary side sensing | [2008/19] | French: | Régulateur pour une alimentation à découpage à retour isolée utilisant une détection primaire | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 06.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006055433 (YANG TA-YUNG [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9,11,13,14,16-21,25,27,29,30,32 * the whole document *; | [Y] - LINEAR TECHNOLOGY, "LT1425 - Isolated Flyback Switching Regulator", INTERNET ARTICLE, (1997), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://cds.linear.com/docs/Datasheet/1425fa.pdf, (20090515), XP002528341 [Y] 1-7,9,11,13,14,16-21,25,27,29,30,32 * 1,7,9,10 * |